Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Alain Leroy, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kilwa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1920BornHerbeumont, Belgium
1 Aug 194323.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
24 Aug 196242.5AppointedBishop of Kilwa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 Dec 196242.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kilwa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
19 Dec 197555.8ResignedBishop of Kilwa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
27 Mar 198565.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Kilwa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Joseph Alain Leroy:
Bishop Joseph Alain Leroy O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kilwa

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 188

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015