Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Köstner

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gurk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1906BornKlagenfurt
25 Oct 193125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Gurk, Austria
25 Jun 194539.3AppointedBishop of Gurk, Austria
5 Aug 194539.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
25 Apr 198175.1RetiredBishop of Gurk, Austria
1 Jan 198275.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Gurk, Austria

MicroData Summary for Josef Köstner:
Bishop Josef Köstner (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gurk

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013