Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Laurent Koerber, C.S.Sp.

Vicar Apostolic of Makokou, Gabon

Titular Bishop of Siccenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1943 Born
10 Dec 197027.2Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
24 Jun 197228.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
7 Mar 200359.5AppointedPrefect of Makokou, Gabon
11 Jul 201470.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Makokou, Gabon
11 Jul 201470.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Siccenna
26 Oct 201471.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Siccenna

MicroData Summary for Joseph Laurent Koerber
Bishop Joseph Laurent Koerber C.S.Sp. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Makokou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSierentz, France

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Makokou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2014
  • ob: CB, 17 Aug 2014
  • c2: CB, 23 Oct 2014
  • c34: CB, 29 Oct 2014
  • mn: CB, 17 Dec 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,315

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast