Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Nepomuk Norbert Klein, O.T. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Brno

Titular Bishop of Syene

Superior General of Order of the Teutonic Knights of Saint Mary’s Hospital in Jerusalem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1866BornBraunseifen
16 Oct 188822.0ProfessedMember of Order of the Teutonic Knights of Saint Mary’s Hospital in Jerusalem
27 Jul 189023.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Teutonic Knights of Saint Mary’s Hospital in Jerusalem
18 Oct 189226.0Solemn ProfessedPriest of Order of the Teutonic Knights of Saint Mary’s Hospital in Jerusalem
7 Dec 191650.1AppointedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
28 Jan 191750.3Ordained BishopBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
11 Feb 191750.3InstalledBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
192356.2AppointedSuperior General of Order of the Teutonic Knights of Saint Mary’s Hospital in Jerusalem
4 Jan 192659.2ResignedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
4 Jan 192659.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Syene
10 Mar 193366.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Brno, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Johann Nepomuk Norbert Klein:
Bishop Johann Nepomuk Norbert Klein O.T. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Brno

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013