Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrei Apollon Katkoff, M.I.C. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Nauplia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1916Born
30 Jul 194427.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
14 Nov 195842.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Nauplia
21 Dec 195842.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nauplia
18 Sep 199578.8DiedTitular Bishop of Nauplia

MicroData Summary for Andrei Apollon Katkoff
Bishop Andrei Apollon Katkoff M.I.C. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Nauplia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIrkutsk

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jul 2017