Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Hernández Arnedo, O.A.R.

Bishop Emeritus of Tianguá, Ceara, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1941 Born
8 Jul 196524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
6 Mar 199150.1AppointedBishop of Tianguá, Ceara, Brazil
19 May 199150.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tianguá, Ceara, Brazil
15 Feb 201776.0RetiredBishop of Tianguá, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Hernández Arnedo
Bishop Francisco Javier Hernández Arnedo O.A.R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tianguá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCascante, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tianguá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,406
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,637
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Apr 2017