Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Christoph Haus

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Basel

Titular Bishop of Domitiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1652BornStein-Säckingen
16 Feb 167624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basel, Switzerland
26 Jan 170552.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland
26 Jan 170552.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Domitiopolis
22 Feb 170553.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Domitiopolis
12 Sep 172573.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Johann Christoph Haus:
Bishop Johann Christoph Haus (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Basel

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015