Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Joachim Hahn

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Metellopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1667Born
23 Dec 169023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
5 Dec 171851.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
5 Dec 171851.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
23 Apr 171951.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
12 Apr 172557.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Joachim Hahn
Bishop Johann Joachim Hahn (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFulda

  • a priest for 34.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 266
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018