Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Alfonso Guerrero Contreras, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Barinas, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1951 Born
15 Aug 197726.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
10 Dec 197726.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
6 Dec 199544.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Caroní, Venezuela
6 Dec 199544.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Leptiminus
20 Jan 199644.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leptiminus
9 Apr 201160.2AppointedBishop of Machiques, Venezuela
21 Dec 201867.9AppointedBishop of Barinas, Venezuela
15 Mar 201968.1InstalledBishop of Barinas, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Jesús Alfonso Guerrero Contreras
Bishop Jesús Alfonso Guerrero Contreras O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Barinas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Pedregoza
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de la Chiquinquirá, Church, Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Barinas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,677
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2018
  • i: CB, 13 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 14 Mar 2019

Quantcast