Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso Maria Granello, O.P. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Seleucia Pieria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1840Born
3 Nov 186121.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
16 Dec 186424.3Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Dec 186525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
2 Oct 189757.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia Pieria
10 Oct 189757.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Seleucia Pieria
24 Mar 191170.5DiedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia Pieria

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Maria Granello (VIAF: 88720226)
Archbishop Tommaso Maria Granello O.P. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Seleucia Pieria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna, Italy
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 511
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017