Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fintan Gavin

Bishop of Cork and Ross, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1966 Born
11 Mar 199024.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Dublin, Ireland
7 Jun 199125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
8 Apr 201953.2AppointedBishop of Cork and Ross, Ireland
30 Jun 201953.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cork and Ross, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Fintan Gavin (VIAF: 61279970)
Bishop Fintan Gavin (born ) Bishop of Cork and Ross

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarino, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained DeaconHoly Cross, Church, Drumcondra, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained PriestSt. Vincent de Paul, Church, Marino, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained BishopSt. Mary and St. Anne, Cathedral, Cork, Diocese of Cork and Ross

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cork and Ross.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2019
  • od/c01: CB, 8 Apr 2019
  • loc: CL, 8 Apr 2019
  • ob: CB, 16 Apr 2019
  • c2+: CB, 27 May 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Number 20,171

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast