Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnaud-Antoine Garnault, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Siam

Titular Bishop of Metellopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1745¹BornToulouse, France
10 Mar 178641.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand
10 Mar 178641.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
15 Apr 178742.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
4 Mar 181166.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Arnaud-Antoine Garnault
Bishop Arnaud-Antoine Garnault M.E.P. (born 1745, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Siam

  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1787, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 287, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016