Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pierre Magny, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Priest of La Société des Missions Etrangères


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1748BornRozoy-sur-Serre, France
28 May 177426.2Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
28 Sep 178436.5AppointedCoadjutor Superior of Karnatic Mission / Pondicherry, India
28 Sep 178436.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Paneade
1 May 182274.1DiedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Pierre Magny:
Father Pierre Magny M.E.P. (born , died ) Priest of La Société des Missions Etrangères

  • a priest for 47.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 326
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016