Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Maria (Ferdinando) Fortini, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bombay

Titular Bishop of Calama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1795BornRoma
16 Jul 181620.7ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
8 Aug 183741.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bombay, India
8 Aug 183741.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Calama
13 May 183842.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calama
9 Oct 184044.9SucceededVicar Apostolic of Bombay, India
5 Jan 184852.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Bombay, India

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria (Ferdinando) Fortini:
Bishop Luigi Maria (Ferdinando) Fortini O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bombay

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013