Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Norberto do Amaral

Bishop of Maliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1956 BornAinaro
18 Oct 198832.7Ordained PriestPriest of Díli, Timor-Leste
30 Jan 201054.0AppointedBishop of Maliana, Timor-Leste
24 Apr 201054.2Ordained BishopBishop of Maliana, Timor-Leste
25 Apr 201054.2InstalledBishop of Maliana, Timor-Leste

MicroData Summary for Norberto do Amaral:
Bishop Norberto do Amaral (born ) Bishop of Maliana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Maliana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,632

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013