Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basílio do Nascimento

Bishop of Baucau

Apostolic Administrator of Díli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1950 BornSuai
25 Jun 197727.0Ordained PriestPriest of Díli, Timor-Leste
30 Nov 199646.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Baucau, Timor-Leste
30 Nov 199646.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Septimunicia
6 Jan 199746.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Septimunicia
26 Nov 200252.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Díli, Timor-Leste
6 Mar 200453.7AppointedBishop of Baucau, Timor-Leste
9 Feb 201564.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Díli, Timor-Leste

MicroData Summary for Basílio do Nascimento:
Bishop Basílio do Nascimento (born ) Bishop of Baucau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Baucau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,883
  • ab: CB, 10 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 3 Apr 2015