Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gentil Diniz Barreto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1910Born
23 Jun 193322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil
11 Jun 196049.5AppointedBishop of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
21 Sep 196049.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
14 Mar 198473.3ResignedBishop of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
9 Oct 198877.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Gentil Diniz Barreto
Bishop Gentil Diniz Barreto (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mossoró

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlinda

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,960, Number 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast