Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephan von Clodh (Cloth), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Fulda

Titular Bishop of Derbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1674BornHennen
8 Sep 169521.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Sep 169622.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Oct 169824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Jan 172752.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fulda, Germany
20 Jan 172752.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Derbe
23 Mar 172753.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Derbe
5 Sep 172753.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Stephan von Clodh (Cloth):
Bishop Stephan von Clodh (Cloth) O.S.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Fulda

  • a priest for 28.8 years
  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 183
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1727, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015