Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Capistran Aimé Cayer, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto}

Titular Bishop of Cissi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1900Born
11 Jul 192626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
26 May 194949.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto}
26 May 194949.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cissi
17 Sep 194949.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cissi
13 Apr 197877.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto}

MicroData Summary for Jean de Capistran Aimé Cayer
Bishop Jean de Capistran Aimé Cayer O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapelton, Canada

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018