Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Youhanna Kabes

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt

Titular Bishop of Cleopatris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1919Born
1 Aug 194323.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 195838.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
7 Jun 195838.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cleopatris
27 Jul 195838.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cleopatris
28 Jun 198565.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Youhanna Kabes
Bishop Youhanna Kabes (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCheikh Zein el Dine

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018