Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Hilario Bosset (Boset)

Deceased

Bishop of Mérida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1799BornPuerto de Guayra
1 Jun 182223.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 184243.0AppointedBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
8 May 184243.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
1873¹74.0DiedBishop of Mérida, Venezuela

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Hilario Bosset (Boset):
Bishop Juan Hilario Bosset (Boset) (born ) Bishop of Mérida

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 186

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013