Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Niño

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1812¹Born
27 May 185644.4AppointedBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
5 Oct 185644.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
12 Feb 186452.1DiedBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Luis Niño
Bishop José Luis Niño (born 1812, died ) Bishop of Nueva Pamplona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Rosa de Viterbo, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
Ordained BishopSan Antonio del Táchira, Diocese of Mérida, Venezuela
Death PlaceSan Antonio del Táchira, Diocese of Mérida, Venezuela

  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 407
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017