Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Conway Benjamin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Townsville


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1925BornRockhampton
25 Jul 194924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Rockhampton, Australia
14 Feb 198458.9AppointedBishop of Townsville, Australia
9 May 198459.2Ordained BishopBishop of Townsville, Australia
18 Apr 200075.1RetiredBishop of Townsville, Australia
6 Mar 201691.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Townsville, Australia

MicroData Summary for Raymond Conway Benjamin
Bishop Raymond Conway Benjamin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Townsville

  • a priest for 66.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 7 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 8 Mar 2016