Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Gerard Tynan

Deceased

Bishop of Rockhampton, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1907Born
21 Mar 193123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Brisbane, Australia
14 Mar 194638.3AppointedBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
20 Jun 194638.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
3 Jun 196052.5DiedBishop of Rockhampton, Australia

MicroData Summary for Andrew Gerard Tynan
Bishop Andrew Gerard Tynan (born , died ) Bishop of Rockhampton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrisbane

  • a priest for 29.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • op/c1: CB, 18 Jan 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018