Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Indalecio Barreto

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1818¹Born
21 Mar 187355.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
21 Mar 187355.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dora
19 Oct 187355.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dora
16 Jan 187456.0AppointedBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
20 Mar 187557.2DiedBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Indalecio Barreto
Bishop Indalecio Barreto (born 1818, died ) Bishop of Nueva Pamplona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSomondoco
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 250, and Page 407
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018