Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Stefan Cardinal Wyszyński

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

Archbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1901Born
5 Apr 192422.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
3 Aug 192423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
4 Mar 194644.5AppointedBishop of Lublin, Poland
12 May 194644.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lublin, Poland
12 Nov 194847.2AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
12 Nov 194847.2AppointedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
12 Jan 195351.4Elevated to Cardinal
18 May 195755.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
28 May 198179.8DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
12 Sep 2021Beatified

MicroData Summary for Stefan Wyszyński (VIAF: 112935997)
Stefan Cardinal Wyszyński (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZuzela, Diocese of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów
Ordained PriestWłocławek, Diocese of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)
Ordained BishopJasna Góra, Monastery, Częstochowa, Diocese of Częstochowa
Death PlaceWarsaw, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Warsaw, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
  • a cardinal for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1946, Number 34
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 337, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 387, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 523, Ascendance
  • beat: CB, 21 Oct 2019
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 681, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 980, Ascendance
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • beat: CB, 23 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast