Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marian Duś

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

Titular Bishop of Thenae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1938Born
9 Jun 196829.9Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
21 Dec 198547.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
21 Dec 198547.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thenae
6 Jan 198647.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thenae
4 Nov 201375.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
9 Sep 202183.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Marian Duś
Bishop Marian Duś (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa {Warsaw}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRóza
Ordained PriestSaint John the Baptist, Cathedral, Warszawa, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}
Ordained BishopSaint John the Baptist, Cathedral, Warszawa, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}
Death PlaceWarszawa, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,142
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2013
  • d: CB, 9 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 Sep 2021

Quantcast