Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Czerniak

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gniezno, Poland

Titular Bishop of Eudocia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1906Born
12 Jun 193225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
18 Nov 195851.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
18 Nov 195851.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Eudocia
2 Feb 195952.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eudocia
11 Feb 198982.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
3 Feb 199992.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Czerniak
Bishop Jan Czerniak (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSokolniki
Ordained BishopGniezno, Archdiocese of Gniezno

  • a priest for 66.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1959, Number 7
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Number 8,745

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Jun 2021

Quantcast