Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zbigniew Kiernikowski

Bishop Emeritus of Legnica, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1946 Born
6 Jun 197124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno, Poland
28 Mar 200255.7AppointedBishop of Siedlce, Poland
20 May 200255.8Ordained BishopBishop of Siedlce, Poland
16 Apr 201467.7AppointedBishop of Legnica, Poland
28 Jun 202174.9RetiredBishop of Legnica, Poland

MicroData Summary for Zbigniew Kiernikowski
Bishop Zbigniew Kiernikowski (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Legnica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzamarzewo
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Legnica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,188
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2014
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Jun 2021

Quantcast