Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Czajka

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland

Titular Bishop of Centuria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1897Born
20 Mar 192022.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Jun 192022.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 Aug 194446.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland
5 Aug 194446.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Centuria
28 Oct 194446.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centuria
4 Jul 196567.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Czajka (VIAF: 88738390)
Bishop Stanisław Czajka (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKamienna
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Częstochowa, Diocese of Częstochowa

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1944, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Apr 2021

Quantcast