Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Stefan Gałecki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland

Titular Bishop of Maiuca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1932Born
23 Jun 195725.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Feb 197441.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland
4 Feb 197441.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Maiuca
17 Mar 197441.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maiuca
22 Sep 200775.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland
27 Apr 202188.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Stefan Gałecki (VIAF: 899152988198212790004)
Bishop Jan Stefan Gałecki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Szczecin-Kamień

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZalesie
Death PlaceSzczecin, Archdiocese of Szczecin-Kamień

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 47.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Sep 2007
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 27 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast