Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Battaglia

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Apostolic Administrator of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1963 Born
8 Aug 198724.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Catanzaro-Squillace, Italy
6 Feb 198825.0Ordained PriestPriest of Catanzaro-Squillace, Italy
24 Jun 201653.4AppointedBishop of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
3 Sep 201653.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
2 Oct 201653.7InstalledBishop of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
12 Dec 202057.8AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
2 Feb 202158.0InstalledArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
2 Feb 202158.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Battaglia
Archbishop Domenico Battaglia (born ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSatriano
Ordained PriestSanta Maria di Altavilla, Church, Satriano, Archdiocese of Catanzaro-Squillace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Catanzaro, Archdiocese of Catanzaro-Squillace

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2016
  • ob/i: CB, 24 Jun 2016
  • c2+: CB, 18 Aug 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,091
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2020
  • loc: AM, 23 Dec 2020
  • aadm: CB, 7 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 May 2021

Quantcast