Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Maurizio Aloise

Archbishop-Elect of Rossano-Cariati, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1969 Born
18 Nov 199526.5Ordained PriestPriest of Catanzaro-Squillace, Italy
20 Mar 202151.9AppointedArchbishop of Rossano-Cariati, Italy
13 May 202152.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano-Cariati, Italy
12 Jun 202152.1InstalledArchbishop of Rossano-Cariati, Italy

MicroData Summary for Maurizio Aloise
Father Maurizio Aloise (born ) Archbishop-Elect of Rossano-Cariati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatanzaro, Archdiocese of Catanzaro
Ordained BishopCo-Cathedral, Squillace, Archdiocese of Catanzaro-Squillace

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Rossano-Cariati.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2021
  • ob/i: CB, 21 Mar 2021
  • c2: CB, 3 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 May 2021

Quantcast