Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gaetano Castello

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Novae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1957 Born
16 Oct 198225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Teramo-Atri, Italy
25 Jan 199335.6IncardinatedPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
27 Sep 202164.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
27 Sep 202164.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Novae
31 Oct 202164.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Novae

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Castello
Father Gaetano Castello (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopMaria Santissima Assunta, Cathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Sep 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 27 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Sep 2021

Quantcast