Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Mazzafaro

Bishop of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1955 Born
11 Oct 200045.6Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
7 May 202166.2AppointedBishop of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
12 Jun 202166.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Mazzafaro
Bishop Giuseppe Mazzafaro (born ) Bishop of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopPiazza San Martino, Cerreto Sannita, Diocese of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cerreto Sannita-Telese-Sant’Agata de’ Goti.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 May 2021
  • ob: CB, 22 May 2021
  • c2: CB, 30 May 2021
  • c34: CB, 3 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Jun 2021

Quantcast