Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francesco Beneduce, S.J.

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Gaudiaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1956 Born
1980²23.4EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
22 Jun 198528.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
3 Dec 199438.3Perpetual VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
27 Sep 202165.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
27 Sep 202165.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gaudiaba
31 Oct 202165.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gaudiaba

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Beneduce
Father Francesco Beneduce S.J. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrumo Nevano, Diocese of Aversa
Ordained BishopMaria Santissima Assunta, Cathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Sep 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 27 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Sep 2021

Quantcast