Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Ksawery Zglenicki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

Titular Bishop of Gortyna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1767³BornMaluszyn
3 Apr 179022.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kraków, Poland
18 Dec 179023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków, Poland
27 Sep 182456.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland
27 Sep 182456.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Gortyna
12 Dec 182457.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gortyna
27 Jan 184173.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Ksawery Zglenicki
Bishop Franciszek Ksawery Zglenicki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 205
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Jun 2016