Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomasz Nowiński, C.R.S. Sepul. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

Titular Bishop of Byblus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1746³BornScarbimiriev
25 May 177124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Other
23 Sep 181669.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland
23 Sep 181669.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Byblus
27 Oct 181669.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Byblus
4 Jan 183083.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomasz Nowiński
Bishop Tomasz Nowiński C.R.S. Sepul. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 52
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 123
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,308

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Jun 2016