Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barthélemy Yaouda Hourgo

Bishop of Yagoua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1964 BornMayo-Ouldémé
16 Jun 199632.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Maroua-Mokolo, Cameroon
8 Nov 199733.7Ordained PriestPriest of Maroua-Mokolo, Cameroon
31 May 200844.3AppointedBishop of Yagoua, Cameroon
1 Oct 200844.6Ordained BishopBishop of Yagoua, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Barthélemy Yaouda Hourgo:
Bishop Barthélemy Yaouda Hourgo (born ) Bishop of Yagoua

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Yagoua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2008
  • ob: JPG
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,974

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015