Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Wübbe

Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück

Titular Bishop of Ros Cré


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1966 BornLengerich
20 May 199327.2Ordained PriestPriest of Osnabrück, Germany
18 Jun 201347.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
18 Jun 201347.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ros Cré
1 Sep 201347.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ros Cré

MicroData Summary for Johannes Wübbe:
Bishop Johannes Wübbe (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Osnabrück.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2013
  • ob: CB, 18 Jun 2013
  • c2+: CB, 17 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,857

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014