Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Norbert Werbs

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hamburg

Titular Bishop of Amaura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1940 BornRostock-Warnemünde
1 Jul 196424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Hamburg, Germany
7 Jan 198140.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Schwerin, Germany
7 Jan 198140.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Amaura
25 Mar 198140.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amaura
24 Oct 199454.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hamburg, Germany
20 May 201575.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Hamburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Norbert Werbs:
Bishop Norbert Werbs (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hamburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Hamburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015