Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Joseph Wallace

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rockhampton, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1919Born
26 Jul 194223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Rockhampton, Australia
24 Jan 197455.0AppointedBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
23 Apr 197455.2Ordained BishopBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
8 May 199071.2ResignedBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
8 Nov 199071.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Rockhampton, Australia

MicroData Summary for Bernard Joseph Wallace
Bishop Bernard Joseph Wallace (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rockhampton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelbourne, Archdiocese of Melbourne
Ordained BishopRockampton, Diocese of Rockhampton

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 24, Number 1,364

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast