Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Voß (Voss)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

Titular Bishop of Thisiduo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1937BornLangenberg-Benteler
10 Oct 196427.6Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
18 Mar 198851.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
18 Mar 198851.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thisiduo
24 Apr 198851.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thisiduo
16 Dec 200972.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Josef Voß (Voss):
Bishop Josef Voß (Voss) (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,625
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013