Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Sommeng Vorachak

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Savannakhet

Titular Bishop of Muzuca in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1933BornXienwang
29 Jun 196330.3Ordained PriestPriest of Savannakhet, Laos
21 Apr 199764.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Savannakhet, Laos
21 Apr 199764.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Muzuca in Proconsulari
19 Oct 199764.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Muzuca in Proconsulari
14 Jul 200976.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Savannakhet, Laos

MicroData Summary for Jean Sommeng Vorachak:
Bishop Jean Sommeng Vorachak (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Savannakhet

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,160
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013