Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Savannakhet

Vicariatus Apostolicus Savannakhetensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Name Changed: 26 November 1963
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Lao People’s Democratic Republic
  • Square Kilometers: 38,089 (14,711 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Centre Catholique, B.P. 012, Thakhek, Khammouane, Laos
  • Telephone: (051)212-184
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Thakhek
21 December 1950ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Laos Prefecture Apostolic of Thakhek (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Thakhek
24 February 1958ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Thakhek Vicariate Apostolic of Thakhek
Vicariate Apostolic of Savannakhet
26 November 1963Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Thakhek Vicariate Apostolic of Savannakhet
12 June 1967Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Savannakhet Vicariate Apostolic of Paksé (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Savannakhet
19706,370600,0001.1%4111542411ap1971
19746,777681,0001.0%71118376115116ap1991
199910,7431,375,100.8%771,5343452ap2000
200010,7551,536,771.7%661,7923954ap2001
200110,9671,847,920.6%661,8274054ap2002
200211,5262,200,750.5%771,6464054ap2003
200412,5002,700,250.5%662,0834754ap2005
201013,5651,325,9661.0%662,2605349ap2011
201412,3171,325,000.9%6281,53934643ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.9, 4 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015