Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael José Verger y Suau, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1722BornSantanyi, Spain
16 Dec 178260.1AppointedBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
22 Jun 178360.6Ordained BishopBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
20 Dec 178361.1InstalledBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
5 Jul 179067.7DiedBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México

MicroData Summary for Rafael José Verger y Suau:
Bishop Rafael José Verger y Suau O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Linares o Nueva León

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,415
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 99, Number 513
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016