Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustine Tochukwu Ukwuoma

Bishop of Orlu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1953 BornAmucha
30 Jul 198329.9Ordained PriestPriest of Orlu, Nigeria
25 Mar 200854.6AppointedBishop of Orlu, Nigeria
21 Jun 200854.8Ordained BishopBishop of Orlu, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Augustine Tochukwu Ukwuoma:
Bishop Augustine Tochukwu Ukwuoma (born ) Bishop of Orlu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Orlu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,763

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013