Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sylvester Philip Wang Tao-nan (Uamtaonan), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fengxiang [Fengsiang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1892Born
31 Oct 192028.6Ordained PriestPriest
192936.8ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Minor
26 Oct 193341.6AppointedPrefect of Fengsiang [Fengxiang], China
9 Jun 194250.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Athribis
9 Jun 194250.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fengsiang [Fengxiang], China
20 Sep 194250.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Athribis
11 Apr 194654.1AppointedBishop of Fengxiang [Fengsiang], China
4 Oct 194957.5DiedBishop of Fengxiang [Fengsiang], China

MicroData Summary for Sylvester Philip Wang Tao-nan (Uamtaonan)
Bishop Sylvester Philip Wang Tao-nan (Uamtaonan) O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Fengxiang [Fengsiang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoleokow

  • a priest for 28.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,902
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018