Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eugénio Trigueiros, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Goa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1684³BornLisboa, Portugal
21 Feb 172541.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Macau, China
21 Feb 172541.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
7 Dec 172743.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
20 Sep 173551.6SucceededBishop of Macau, China
22 Feb 173955.0SelectedArchbishop of Goa, India
19 Dec 174056.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Goa, India
19 Apr 174157.2DiedArchbishop of Goa, India

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eugénio Trigueiros:
Archbishop Eugénio Trigueiros O.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Goa

  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 251, and Page 411
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 227

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015