Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Costantino Trapani, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mazara del Vallo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1912BornAlimena
2 Dec 193422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
4 Oct 196250.5AppointedBishop of Nicosia, Italy
11 Nov 196250.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nicosia, Italy
29 Oct 197664.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
21 Mar 197765.0SucceededBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
7 Dec 198775.7RetiredBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
4 Mar 198875.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Costantino Trapani:
Bishop Costantino Trapani O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mazara del Vallo

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 179

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013